Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jailton de Oliveira Lino, P.S.D.P.

Bishop of Teixeira de Freitas-Caravelas, Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1965 Born
1 Jan 198519.9ProfessedMember of Poveri Servi della Divina Provvidenza
9 Jul 198823.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Poveri Servi della Divina Provvidenza
17 Dec 198823.8Ordained PriestPriest of Poveri Servi della Divina Provvidenza
15 Nov 201752.7AppointedBishop of Teixeira de Freitas-Caravelas, Bahia, Brazil
13 Jan 201852.9Ordained BishopBishop of Teixeira de Freitas-Caravelas, Bahia, Brazil
9 Feb 201853.0InstalledBishop of Teixeira de Freitas-Caravelas, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Jailton de Oliveira Lino
Bishop Jailton de Oliveira Lino P.S.D.P. (born ) Bishop of Teixeira de Freitas-Caravelas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFeira de Santana, Diocese of Feira de Santana, Bahia
Ordained DeaconPorto Alegre
Ordained PriestFeira de Santana
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora de Caravaggio, Farroupilha, Archdiocese of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Teixeira de Freitas-Caravelas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Nov 2017
  • od/c01: CB, 15 Nov 2017
  • ob/c2+: CB, 24 Nov 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Number 19,663

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast