Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Joseph Wang Zhenye] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Yan’an [Yenan], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1911¹Born
1943²32.0Ordained PriestPriest
17 Nov 199180.8Ordained BishopBishop of Yan’an [Yenan], China
17 Dec 199988.9DiedBishop of Yan’an [Yenan], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Wang Zhenye
Bishop Joseph Wang Zhenye (born 1911, died ) Bishop of Yan’an [Yenan]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopXi’an, Archdiocese of Xi’an [Sian, Chang-An]

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,127

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast