Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Tong Hui

Deceased

Bishop of Yan’an [Yenan], China

Note/Previous Titular See: (Yulin)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1933Born
23 Dec 195623.3Ordained PriestPriest
22 Aug 199259.0SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Yan’an [Yenan], China
19 Mar 199460.5Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Yan’an [Yenan], China
17 Dec 199966.3SelectedBishop of Yan’an [Yenan], China
25 Mar 201177.6RetiredBishop of Yan’an [Yenan], China
27 Oct 201683.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Yan’an [Yenan], China

MicroData Summary for Francis Tong Hui
Bishop Francis Tong Hui (born , died ) Bishop of Yan’an [Yenan]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLingtong
Ordained BishopXi’an, Archdiocese of Xi’an [Sian, Chang-An]
Death PlaceTangdu, Hospital, Xi’an, Archdiocese of Xi’an [Sian, Chang-An]

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 24 Sep 2018
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2,017, Page 1,141
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,131
  • c134: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ab: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • r: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 28 Mar 2020

Quantcast