Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Dang Mingyan

Bishop of Xi’an [Sian, Chang-An], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1967 Born
15 Sep 199124.1Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 200537.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Xi’an [Sian, Chang-An], China
26 Jul 200538.0Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Xi’an [Sian, Chang-An], China
25 May 200638.8AppointedBishop of Xi’an [Sian, Chang-An], China

MicroData Summary for Anthony Dang Mingyan
Bishop Anthony Dang Mingyan (born ) Bishop of Xi’an [Sian, Chang-An]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArchdiocese of Xi’an [Sian, Chang-An]
Ordained BishopSaint Francis, Cathedral, Xi’an, Archdiocese of Xi’an [Sian, Chang-An]

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Xi’an [Sian, Chang-An].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 181, Number 14,951
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 28 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast