Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Patriotic Bishop Joseph Zhen Changcheng (Chen Changcheng, Tangtionsin)] †

Chinese Patriotic Catholic Association

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of Fuzhou [Foochow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1913Born
27 Jan 193723.9Ordained PriestPriest
24 Feb 199178.0Ordained BishopBishop of Fuzhou [Foochow], China
18 Dec 200693.8DiedBishop of Fuzhou [Foochow], China

MicroData Summary for Joseph Zhen Changcheng (Chen Changcheng, Tangtionsin)
Bishop Joseph Zhen Changcheng (Chen Changcheng, Tangtionsin) (born , died ) Bishop of Fuzhou [Foochow]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopFuanchuanpu, Cathedral, Foochow, Archdiocese of Fuzhou [Foochow]

  • a priest for 69.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 20 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,124

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast