Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Paolo Leonardi

Deceased

Bishop of Ascoli Piceno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1714BornAmelia
4 Jun 174632.2Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 175541.0AppointedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
1 Jun 175541.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
21 Jun 179278.3DiedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Paolo Leonardi:
Bishop Pietro Paolo Leonardi (born , died ) Bishop of Ascoli Piceno

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 37.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1791
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 101
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1755, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015