Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mathieu Thoreau

Deceased

Bishop of Dol


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1612BornPoitiers
28 Feb 166148.8SelectedBishop of Dol, France
8 Aug 166149.3ConfirmedBishop of Dol, France
2 Oct 166149.4Ordained BishopBishop of Dol, France
31 Jan 169279.7DiedBishop of Dol, France

MicroData Summary for Mathieu Thoreau:
Bishop Mathieu Thoreau (born , died ) Bishop of Dol

  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 175
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 186
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1661, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 7 Apr 2015