Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Louis de Polastron

Deceased

Bishop of Lectoure


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1653¹BornMarennes
5 Apr 169239.2SelectedBishop of Lectoure, France
6 Oct 169239.7ConfirmedBishop of Lectoure, France
9 Nov 169239.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lectoure, France
13 Oct 171764.7DiedBishop of Lectoure, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François-Louis de Polastron:
Bishop François-Louis de Polastron (born 1653, died ) Bishop of Lectoure

  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 240
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 27 Apr 2015