Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Sokoto

Dioecesis Sokotoensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Matthew Hassan Kukah, Bishop
  • Kevin Joseph Aje, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 16 June 1964
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Kaduna
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Nigeria
  • Square Kilometers: 109,507 (42,297 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 2556, 39 Ahmadu Bello Way, Sokoto State, Nigeria
  • Telephone: (060)23-22-28

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Sokoto
29 June 1953ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Kaduna Prefecture Apostolic of Sokoto (erected)
Diocese of Sokoto
16 June 1964ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Sokoto Diocese of Sokoto
15 December 1995Territory LostDiocese of Ilorin
Diocese of Minna
Diocese of Sokoto
Prefecture Apostolic of Kontagora (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Sokoto
19701,6486,929,562.0%1111149159ap1971
198013,3037,393,000.2%41317782116136ap1981
199019,5489,509,000.2%116171,1491769ap1991
199943,72112,001,782.4%213241,8214289ap2000
200039,62312,008,482.3%213241,65042710ap2001
200142,96412,100,342.4%245291,48162810ap2002
200245,42812,104,441.4%255301,51464611ap2003
200349,62312,204,542.4%244281,77253611ap2004
200460,55412,251,910.5%305351,73064714ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011