Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roger d’Aumont

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Avranches


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Mar 1645AppointedBishop of Avranches, France
14 May 1645Ordained BishopBishop of Avranches, France
5 Jan 1651ResignedBishop of Avranches, France
25 Mar 1653DiedBishop Emeritus of Avranches, France

MicroData Summary for Roger d’Aumont:
Bishop Roger d’Aumont (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Avranches

  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 65
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 25 Mar 2015