Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel-Philippe de Froullay de Tessé

Deceased

Bishop of Avranches


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1615¹BornVernie
13 Apr 166853.2SelectedBishop of Avranches, France
26 Nov 166853.9ConfirmedBishop of Avranches, France
20 Jan 166954.0Ordained BishopBishop of Avranches, France
27 Apr 168974.3DiedBishop of Avranches, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriel-Philippe de Froullay de Tessé:
Bishop Gabriel-Philippe de Froullay de Tessé (born 1615, died ) Bishop of Avranches

  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 65
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1669, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 14 Apr 2015