Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ariel Lascarro Tapia

Bishop of Magangué, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1967 Born
22 Oct 199426.9Ordained PriestPriest of Cartagena, Colombia
21 Nov 201447.0AppointedBishop of Magangué, Colombia
17 Jan 201547.2Ordained BishopBishop of Magangué, Colombia
24 Jan 201547.2InstalledBishop of Magangué, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Ariel Lascarro Tapia
Bishop Ariel Lascarro Tapia (born ) Bishop of Magangué

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarmen de Bolivar

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Magangué.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2014
  • ob/i/c2: CB, 21 Nov 2014
  • c34: CB, 14 Jan 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,353

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast