Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Odoardo Agnelli

Deceased

President of the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy

Titular Bishop of Troas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1813Born
23 Sep 183723.9Ordained PriestPriest
Sep 1875³61.8AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy
3 Apr 187662.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Troas
9 Jul 187662.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Troas
24 Sep 187864.9DiedPresident of the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Odoardo Agnelli
Bishop Odoardo Agnelli (born , died ) President of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrottammare, Diocese of Ripatransone, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Fermo, Archdiocese of Fermo, Italy

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,542
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 568
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1876, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Mar 2017