Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefano Gerbino di Cannitello, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Trapani


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1834BornPalermo
25 Mar 185823.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
3 Jun 189055.4AppointedPrelate of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
29 Nov 189560.9AppointedBishop of Trapani, Italy
12 Jan 189661.0Ordained BishopBishop of Trapani, Italy
Apr 1906³71.3ResignedBishop of Trapani, Italy
24 May 190671.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Trapani, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stefano Gerbino di Cannitello:
Bishop Stefano Gerbino di Cannitello O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Trapani

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 251

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013