Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Maria Audino

Deceased

Bishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1861³Born
19 Sep 188523.9Ordained PriestPriest
28 Nov 189837.1AppointedBishop of Lipari, Italy
11 Dec 189837.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lipari, Italy
22 Jun 190341.6AppointedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
21 Jun 193371.6DiedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicola Maria Audino (VIAF: 89640969)
Bishop Nicola Maria Audino (born , died ) Bishop of Mazara del Vallo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVallelunga-Pratameno, Diocese of Caltanissetta
Ordained BishopCathedral, Palermo, Archdiocese of Palermo

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1934
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 346, and Page 374
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017