Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Constitutional Bishop Jean-Louis Gouttes] †

Civil Constitution of the Clergy

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of [Saône-et-Loire (Constitutional), France]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1739Born
15 Feb 179151.2SelectedBishop of [Saône-et-Loire (Constitutional), France]
3 Apr 179151.3Ordained BishopBishop of [Saône-et-Loire (Constitutional), France]
26 Mar 179454.3DiedBishop of [Saône-et-Loire (Constitutional), France]

MicroData Summary for Jean-Louis Gouttes (VIAF: 76388967)
Bishop Jean-Louis Gouttes (born , died ) Bishop of Saône-et-Loire

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTulle
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 9 Oct 2018; Data: 12 Oct 2018

Quantcast