Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Chan Soon Cheong

Bishop Emeritus of Melaka-Johor


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1926 BornSelama
9 Aug 195933.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 197246.4AppointedBishop of Malacca-Johor, Malaysia
8 Jun 197346.9Ordained BishopBishop of Malacca-Johor, Malaysia
10 Dec 200175.4RetiredBishop of Melaka-Johor, Malaysia

MicroData Summary for James Chan Soon Cheong:
Bishop James Chan Soon Cheong (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Melaka-Johor

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Melaka-Johor.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 13 Dec 2013