Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume-Lucien-Léon Lacroix

Deceased

Bishop of Tarentaise

Titular Bishop of Vallis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1855BornReilhaguet
23 Sep 188227.7Ordained PriestPriest
5 Apr 190146.2SelectedBishop of Tarentaise, France
18 Apr 190146.3ConfirmedBishop of Tarentaise, France
24 Jun 190146.5Ordained BishopBishop of Tarentaise, France
17 Oct 190752.8ResignedBishop of Tarentaise, France
9 Dec 192166.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Vallis
27 Jan 192267.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Tarentaise, France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume-Lucien-Léon Lacroix:
Bishop Guillaume-Lucien-Léon Lacroix (born , died ) Bishop of Tarentaise

  • a priest for 39.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 535
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013