Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Zhumadian [Chumatien]

Dioecesis Ciumatienensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Kaifeng [Kaifeng]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 12,700 (4,905 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Nan-Da-Yuan, Zhumadian, Henan, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Chumatien [Zhumadian]
2 March 1933ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Chumatien [Zhumadian] (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Chumatien [Zhumadian]
9 November 1944ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Chumatien [Zhumadian] Vicariate Apostolic of Chumatien [Zhumadian]
Diocese of Zhumadian [Chumatien]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Chumatien [Zhumadian] Diocese of Zhumadian [Chumatien]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Zhumadian [Chumatien]
195014,1001,300,0001.1%16168815ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.7.6, 1 Jan 2012; data: 4 Jan 2012