Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simon Bárta

Deceased

Bishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1874Born
16 Mar 188914.3Ordained PriestPriest of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
16 Dec 192046.1AppointedBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
20 Feb 192146.3Ordained BishopBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
2 May 194065.5DiedBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Simon Bárta
Bishop Simon Bárta (born , died ) Bishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZimatice

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,629
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 181, Number 14,933
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 12
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 95

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast