Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Barry Christopher Knestout

Bishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1962 Born
24 Jun 198927.0Ordained PriestPriest of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
18 Nov 200846.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
18 Nov 200846.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Leavenworth
29 Dec 200846.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leavenworth
5 Dec 201755.4AppointedBishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA
12 Jan 201855.5InstalledBishop of Richmond, Virginia, USA

MicroData Summary for Barry Christopher Knestout
Bishop Barry Christopher Knestout (born ) Bishop of Richmond

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCheverly, MD
Ordained BishopSaint Matthew, Cathedral Basilica, Washington, Archdiocese of Washington, District of Columbia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Richmond.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Nov 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 16,002
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Dec 2017
  • i: CB, 5 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast