Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roy Edward Campbell, Jr.

Auxiliary Bishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA

Titular Bishop of Ucres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1947 Born
26 May 200759.5Ordained PriestPriest of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
8 Mar 201769.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
8 Mar 201769.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Ucres
21 Apr 201769.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ucres

MicroData Summary for Roy Edward Campbell, Jr.
Bishop Roy Edward Campbell, Jr. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Washington

EventPlace
Birth PlacePomonkey, MD, Archdiocese of Washington, District of Columbia
Ordained BishopSt. Matthew the Apostle, Cathedral, Washington, Archdiocese of Washington, District of Columbia

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Washington.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Mar 2017
  • c1: CB, 8 Mar 2017
  • ob: CB, 8 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Apr 2017