Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Joseph Klein

Deceased

Bishop of Calgary, Alberta, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1911Born
2 Sep 193423.0Ordained PriestPriest
28 Feb 195240.5AppointedBishop of Saskatoon, Saskatchewan, Canada
30 Apr 195240.7Ordained BishopBishop of Saskatoon, Saskatchewan, Canada
8 May 195240.7InstalledBishop of Saskatoon, Saskatchewan, Canada
25 Feb 196755.5AppointedBishop of Calgary, Alberta, Canada
3 Feb 196856.4DiedBishop of Calgary, Alberta, Canada

MicroData Summary for Francis Joseph Klein
Bishop Francis Joseph Klein (born , died ) Bishop of Calgary

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSedley

  • a priest for 33.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast