Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicodemus Kirima

Deceased

Archbishop of Nyeri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1936BornKaratina
22 Dec 196226.8Ordained PriestPriest of Nyeri, Kenya
27 Feb 197842.0AppointedBishop of Mombasa, Kenya
14 May 197842.2Ordained BishopBishop of Mombasa, Kenya
12 Mar 198852.0AppointedBishop of Nyeri, Kenya
21 May 199054.2AppointedArchbishop of Nyeri, Kenya
27 Nov 200771.7DiedArchbishop of Nyeri, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Nicodemus Kirima:
Archbishop Nicodemus Kirima (born , died ) Archbishop of Nyeri

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013