Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Crane, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sandhurst, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1818Born
12 Aug 184122.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
4 Aug 187455.8AppointedBishop of Sandhurst, Australia
21 Sep 187455.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sandhurst, Australia
23 May 187556.6InstalledBishop of Sandhurst, Australia
21 Oct 190183.0DiedBishop of Sandhurst, Australia

MicroData Summary for Martin Crane
Bishop Martin Crane O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Sandhurst

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarrystown, Diocese of Ferns, Ireland
Ordained BishopPro-Cathedral, Dublin, Archdiocese of Dublin, Ireland

  • a priest for 60.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 498
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1874, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast