Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Tharayil

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kottayam (Syro-Malabar)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1899BornKaipuzha
18 Dec 192627.6Ordained PriestPriest of Kottayam (Syro-Malabar), India
9 Jun 194546.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kottayam (Syro-Malabar), India
9 Jun 194546.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Azotus
7 Oct 194546.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Azotus
8 Jan 195151.6SucceededBishop of Kottayam (Syro-Malabar), India
5 May 197475.0RetiredBishop of Kottayam (Syro-Malabar), India
26 Jul 197576.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Kottayam (Syro-Malabar), India

MicroData Summary for Thomas Tharayil
Bishop Thomas Tharayil (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kottayam

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 25 Jul 2016