Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Kla Juwle

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Cape Palmas, Liberia

Titular Bishop of Tigamibena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1913Born
29 Dec 194633.1Ordained PriestPriest of Cape Palmas, Liberia
30 Jul 197258.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Cape Palmas, Liberia
30 Jul 197258.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tigamibena
26 Nov 197259.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tigamibena
18 Aug 197359.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Cape Palmas, Liberia

MicroData Summary for Patrick Kla Juwle
Bishop Patrick Kla Juwle (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Cape Palmas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrand Cess

  • a priest for 26.6 years
  • a bishop for .7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast