Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop William Joseph Foley

Deceased

Archbishop of Perth, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1931Born
12 Sep 195423.2Ordained PriestPriest of Perth, Australia
13 Jul 198150.0AppointedBishop of Geraldton, Australia
9 Sep 198150.2Ordained BishopBishop of Geraldton, Australia
26 Oct 198352.3AppointedArchbishop of Perth, Australia
14 Dec 198352.4InstalledArchbishop of Perth, Australia
10 Feb 199159.6DiedArchbishop of Perth, Australia

MicroData Summary for William Joseph Foley
Archbishop William Joseph Foley (born , died ) Archbishop of Perth

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNedlands

  • a priest for 36.4 years
  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018