Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Myles McKeon

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bunbury, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1919Born
22 Jun 194728.2Ordained PriestPriest of Perth, Australia
23 May 196243.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Perth, Australia
23 May 196243.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Antipyrgos
12 Sep 196243.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antipyrgos
6 Mar 196949.9AppointedBishop of Bunbury, Australia
18 Feb 198262.8ResignedBishop of Bunbury, Australia
2 May 201697.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Bunbury, Australia

MicroData Summary for Myles McKeon
Bishop Myles McKeon (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bunbury

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDrummin, Ireland

  • a priest for 68.8 years
  • a bishop for 53.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 140
  • d: CB, 2 May 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast