Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thaddeus Ma Daquin

Auxiliary Bishop of Shanghai [Shanghai], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1968² Born
18 Dec 199426.9Ordained PriestPriest of Shanghai [Shanghai], China
30 May 201244.4SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Shanghai [Shanghai], China
7 Jul 201244.5Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Shanghai [Shanghai], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thaddeus Ma Daquin
Bishop Thaddeus Ma Daquin (born 1968) Auxiliary Bishop of Shanghai [Shanghai]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShanghai, Diocese of Shanghai [Shanghai]
Ordained BishopShanghai, Diocese of Shanghai [Shanghai]

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Shanghai [Shanghai].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast