Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Zhuang Jianjian

Bishop Emeritus of Shantou [Swatow], China

Note/Previous Titular See: (Shandou)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1931² Born
21 Dec 198655.9Ordained PriestPriest
18 Sep 200675.7Ordained BishopBishop of Shantou [Swatow], China
22 Jan 201887.0RetiredBishop of Shantou [Swatow], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Peter Zhuang Jianjian
Bishop Peter Zhuang Jianjian (born 1931) Bishop Emeritus of Shantou [Swatow]

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Shantou [Swatow].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Dec 2019
  • b: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 99

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast