Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Adalberto Jiménez Mendoza, O.F.M. Cap.

Vicar Apostolic of Aguarico, Ecuador

Titular Bishop of Ubaba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1969 Born
15 Aug 199021.1Temporary VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
14 Aug 199627.1Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
16 May 199727.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
2 Aug 201748.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Aguarico, Ecuador
2 Aug 201748.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Ubaba
6 Oct 201748.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ubaba

MicroData Summary for José Adalberto Jiménez Mendoza
Bishop José Adalberto Jiménez Mendoza O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Aguarico

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Plácido, Diocese of Portoviejo (Porto Vecchio)
Ordained BishopColiseo Fray Mariano de Ázqueta, Puerto Francisco de Orellana (El Coca)

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Aguarico.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Aug 2017
  • ob/c2+: CB, 13 Aug 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 6 Oct 2017