Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Fulgencio Elorza Legaristi, C.P. †

Deceased

Prelate of Moyobamba, Peru

Titular Bishop of Baliana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1899Born
13 Jul 192424.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
15 Jan 194949.0AppointedPrelate of Moyobamba, Peru
3 Oct 195353.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Baliana
24 Feb 195454.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Baliana
30 Dec 196667.0DiedPrelate of Moyobamba, Peru

MicroData Summary for Martin Fulgencio Elorza Legaristi
Bishop Martin Fulgencio Elorza Legaristi C.P. (born , died ) Prelate of Moyobamba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceElgueta, Spain

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast