Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leoncio Fernández Galilea, C.M.F. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Fernando Poo

Titular Bishop of Ariassus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1892BornTosos, Spain
17 Jun 191624.4Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
18 Jun 193543.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Fernando Poo, Equatorial Guinea
18 Jun 193543.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Ariassus
29 Sep 193543.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ariassus
15 Feb 195765.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Fernando Poo, Equatorial Guinea

MicroData Summary for Leoncio Fernández Galilea:
Bishop Leoncio Fernández Galilea C.M.F. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Fernando Poo

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013