Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Isidro Cardinal Gomá y Tomás

Deceased

Archbishop of Toledo

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1869BornLa Riba
8 Jun 189525.5Ordained PriestPriest of Tarragona, Spain
20 Jun 192757.5AppointedBishop of Tarazona (-Tudela), Spain
2 Oct 192757.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tarazona (-Tudela), Spain
15 Oct 192757.8InstalledBishop of Tarazona (-Tudela), Spain
12 Apr 193363.3AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
16 Dec 193566.0Elevated to Cardinal
16 Dec 193566.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio
22 Aug 194070.7DiedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Isidro Gomá y Tomás:
Cardinal Isidro Gomá y Tomás (born , died ) Archbishop of Toledo

  • a priest for 45.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
  • a cardinal for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013