Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan (Matías) Solá y Farrell, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bluefields

Titular Bishop of Colophon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1884BornSant Llorenç Savall, Spain
25 Mar 190924.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
24 Feb 193146.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bluefields, Nicaragua
24 Feb 193146.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Colophon
22 Apr 193146.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Colophon
1942²57.4ResignedVicar Apostolic of Bluefields, Nicaragua
27 Aug 197389.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bluefields, Nicaragua

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan (Matías) Solá y Farrell:
Bishop Juan (Matías) Solá y Farrell O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bluefields

  • a priest for 64.4 years
  • a bishop for 42.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013