Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Ernesto Iraheta Rivera

Bishop of Santiago de María, El Salvador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1962 Born
27 Dec 198826.9Ordained PriestPriest of San Salvador, El Salvador
4 Jan 201653.9AppointedBishop of Santiago de María, El Salvador
12 Mar 201654.1Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de María, El Salvador

MicroData Summary for William Ernesto Iraheta Rivera
Bishop William Ernesto Iraheta Rivera (born ) Bishop of Santiago de María

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJayaque

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Santiago de María.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Jan 2016
  • ob/c2+: CB, 8 Jan 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Number 18,857

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast