Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carmine Cioffi

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Antaeopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1692³Born
17 Jun 172532.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Jun 172532.9Ordained PriestPriest
11 Feb 173744.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Antaeopolis
12 May 173744.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antaeopolis
1783²90.4DiedTitular Bishop of Antaeopolis

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carmine Cioffi
Bishop Carmine Cioffi (born , died 1783) Titular Bishop of Antaeopolis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorre Orsaia, Diocese of Policastro, Italy
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Donnaregina, Church, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Santa Maria di Montesanto, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 45.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 86
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1737, Number 8
  • c2+: AT, 14 Jun 2018
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,720

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 3 Jul 2018

Quantcast