Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Camille Van Ronslé, C.I.C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Léopoldville, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

Titular Bishop of Tymbrias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1862Born
18 Dec 188624.2Ordained PriestPriest of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
29 Jun 188926.7ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
5 Jun 189633.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Belgian Congo {Congo Belga} o Indipendente, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
5 Jun 189633.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tymbrias
24 Feb 189734.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tymbrias
4 Mar 192663.4ResignedVicar Apostolic of Léopoldville, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
14 Nov 193876.1DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Léopoldville, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for François Camille Van Ronslé
Bishop François Camille Van Ronslé C.I.C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Léopoldville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLovendeghem, Diocese of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
Ordained BishopSte Gudule, Bruxelles, Archdiocese of Mechelen, Belgium

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 41.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,933
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,937
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,939
  • op/ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,932
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 574
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,897, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast