Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guy Bélanger

Deceased

Bishop of Valleyfield, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1928Born
19 May 195123.3Ordained PriestPriest of Valleyfield, Québec, Canada
17 Oct 196941.7AppointedBishop of Valleyfield, Québec, Canada
23 Nov 196941.8Ordained BishopBishop of Valleyfield, Québec, Canada
15 Oct 197547.7DiedBishop of Valleyfield, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Guy Bélanger
Bishop Guy Bélanger (born , died ) Bishop of Valleyfield

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValleyfield

  • a priest for 24.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018