Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Francis Donnelly

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA

Titular Bishop of Nabala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1909Born
29 Jun 193425.1Ordained PriestPriest of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
9 Nov 196455.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA
9 Nov 196455.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Nabala
28 Jan 196555.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nabala
30 Jun 197768.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Hartford, Connecticut, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Francis Donnelly
Bishop Joseph Francis Donnelly (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Hartford

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNorwich, Diocese of Hartford, Connecticut
Ordained PriestHartford, CT, Diocese of Hartford, Connecticut

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB, 11 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast