Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Robert William Spence, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Adelaide, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1860Born
22 Dec 188222.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
24 Dec 188222.9ProfessedPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
2 May 191454.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Adelaide, Australia
2 May 191454.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pessinus
16 Aug 191454.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Pessinus
6 Jul 191555.4SucceededArchbishop of Adelaide, Australia
5 Nov 193474.8DiedArchbishop of Adelaide, Australia

MicroData Summary for Robert William Spence
Archbishop Robert William Spence O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Adelaide

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCork, Ireland
Ordained BishopAdelaide, Archdiocese of Adelaide

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 36
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1914, Number 44
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 63, Number 4,892

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast