Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Patrick Joseph Clune, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Perth, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1864Born
24 Jun 188622.4Ordained PriestPriest of Goulburn, Australia
3 Sep 189430.6ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
21 Dec 191046.9AppointedBishop of Perth, Australia
17 Mar 191147.1Ordained BishopBishop of Perth, Australia
28 Aug 191349.6AppointedArchbishop of Perth, Australia
24 May 193571.3DiedArchbishop of Perth, Australia

MicroData Summary for Patrick Joseph Clune
Archbishop Patrick Joseph Clune C.SS.R. (born , died ) Archbishop of Perth

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRuan, Ireland

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast