Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicariate Apostolic of Mitú

Vicariatus Apostolicus Mituensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Vicariate Apostolic
  • Split: 30 November 1996
  • Vicariate
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Colombia
  • Square Kilometers: 54,000 (20,857 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Casa Episcopal, Calle 14 n. 14-14, Mitu [Vaupes], Colombia
  • Telephone: (8)564-2526
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Mitú
9 June 1949ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Los Llanos de San Martín (Piani di San Martino) Prefecture Apostolic of Mitú (erected)
19 January 1989Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Mitú Vicariate Apostolic of San José del Guaviare (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Mitú-Puerto Inírida
19 June 1989ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Mitú Vicariate Apostolic of Mitú-Puerto Inírida
30 November 1996SplitVicariate Apostolic of Mitú-Puerto Inírida Vicariate Apostolic of Inírida
Vicariate Apostolic of Mitú
Vicariate Apostolic of Mitú
30 November 1996SplitVicariate Apostolic of Mitú-Puerto Inírida Vicariate Apostolic of Inírida
Vicariate Apostolic of Mitú

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Mitú
19501,00010,00010.0%55200813ap1951
196610,32518,00057.4%1919543283310ap1967
197028,00036,00077.8%17171,6472536ap1971
197655,81167,08083.2%115163,4881233016ap1977
1980112,500134,50083.6%215176,617253217ap1981
Vicariate Apostolic of Mitú-Puerto Inírida
199028,00035,00080.0%12122,33313128ap1991
Vicariate Apostolic of Mitú
199920,00026,00076.9%47111,81810169ap2000
200019,80021,90690.4%57121,6509139ap2001
200121,00026,50079.2%77141,50010158ap2002
200223,00028,00082.1%78151,5338129ap2003
200323,00026,30087.5%98171,35210129ap2004
200425,00028,00089.3%69151,66611109ap2005
201023,30029,40079.3%59141,6641299ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 31 Mar 2014