Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert Hermelink Gentiaras, S.C.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tanjungkarang


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1898BornEmmen
19 Jul 192527.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
27 Jun 195253.9AppointedPrefect of Tandjung-Karang, Indonesia
19 Jul 196163.0AppointedBishop of Tandjung-Karang, Indonesia
29 Oct 196163.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tandjung-Karang, Indonesia
18 Apr 197980.7RetiredBishop of Tanjungkarang, Indonesia
25 Feb 198384.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Tanjungkarang, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Albert Hermelink Gentiaras:
Bishop Albert Hermelink Gentiaras S.C.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tanjungkarang

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013