Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Jodoin

Bishop of Bathurst in Canada, New Brunswick


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1957 Born
3 Oct 199235.5Ordained PriestPriest of Sherbrooke, Québec, Canada
22 Jan 201355.8AppointedBishop of Bathurst in Canada, New Brunswick
25 Apr 201356.1Ordained BishopBishop of Bathurst in Canada, New Brunswick

MicroData Summary for Daniel Jodoin
Bishop Daniel Jodoin (born ) Bishop of Bathurst in Canada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGranby

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bathurst in Canada.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Jan 2013
  • ob: CB, 30 Jan 2013
  • c2+: CB, 17 Feb 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,771

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast