Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephen Dami Mamza

Bishop of Yola, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1969 Born
13 Apr 199626.3Ordained PriestPriest of Maiduguri, Nigeria
18 Feb 201141.2AppointedBishop of Yola, Nigeria
7 Apr 201141.3Ordained BishopBishop of Yola, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Stephen Dami Mamza
Bishop Stephen Dami Mamza (born ) Bishop of Yola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBazza

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Yola.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 11 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,032

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast