Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Carlo Gentili

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pesaro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Dec 1794Born
24 Feb 181722.1Ordained PriestPriest
21 Apr 184550.3AppointedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
4 May 184550.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
12 Apr 184752.3AppointedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
10 Oct 1854³59.8ResignedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
22 Apr 185964.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Pesaro, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Carlo Gentili (VIAF: 44676308)
Bishop Giovanni Carlo Gentili (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pesaro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanseverino
Ordained BishopGesu, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1853
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 456
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 324
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1845, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast