Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Aloysius Gogarty, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Kilima-Njaro

Titular Bishop of Themiscyra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1884BornCavan, Ireland
28 Oct 191329.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
23 Dec 192339.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kilima-Njaro, Tanzania
23 Dec 192339.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Themiscyra
9 Jun 192439.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Themiscyra
8 Dec 193147.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Kilima-Njaro, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Henry Aloysius Gogarty:
Bishop Henry Aloysius Gogarty C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Kilima-Njaro

  • a priest for 18.1 years
  • a bishop for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1932
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015