Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Léon Jean Marie Habert

Bishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1960 Born
12 Dec 198828.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Créteil, France
30 Sep 198929.4Ordained PriestPriest of Créteil, France
28 Oct 201050.4AppointedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
9 Jan 201150.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
10 Nov 202060.5AppointedBishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France
10 Jan 202160.6InstalledBishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France

MicroData Summary for Jacques Léon Jean Marie Habert
Bishop Jacques Léon Jean Marie Habert (born ) Bishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Malo, Archdiocese of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)
Ordained DeaconSaint-Saturnin, Church, Nogent-sur-Marne, Diocese of Créteil
Ordained PriestNotre-Dame, Church, Vincennes, Diocese of Créteil
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Sées, Diocese of Sées {Séez}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bayeux (-Lisieux).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Oct 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,933
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 2,011, Number 1
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Nov 2020
  • i: AM, 19 Nov 2020
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 11 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Feb 2021

Quantcast